MD HB1425 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available a specially designed vintage reproduction license plate; prescribing who may apply for and the classes of vehicles eligible for the license plate; providing the manner in which fees will be established, collected, and distributed in connection with the license plate; and requiring that the license plate be made of specified materials and resemble a specified license plate issued by the State in 1910.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction License Plate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-09 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-01 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Counties
Fees
Highways
Historical Matters
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Fees
Highways
Historical Matters
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB1425.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb1425f.pdf |