MD HB1426 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the information required to be included in the annual report to be submitted to certain persons by the Health Services Cost Review Commission to include an update on the status of the State's compliance with the provisions of the current all-payer model contract; altering a certain reporting date from October 1 to May 1; authorizing the Commission, on request by the Secretary of Health, to assist in the implementation of federally approved model programs consistent with the current all-payer model contract; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-04-02SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29HouseFavorable with Amendments {436088/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-13HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-07HouseReferred House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-07HouseMotion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted (134-0)
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback