MD HB1427 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an apprentice hunting license that confers specified rights on a purchaser of the license; authorizing a person to obtain an apprentice hunting license on satisfactory completion of a short online or electronic course of instruction in competency in firearms and hunter safety approved by the Department of Natural Resources; authorizing specified persons to hunt under an apprentice license only if accompanied and directly supervised by a person who is at least 18 years old and has a valid resident nonapprentice hunting license; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Sponsors
Del. Herbert McMillan [R] | Del. Jerry Clark [R] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Del. Jay Jacobs [R] |
Del. Jay Jalisi [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994035/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | Special Order until 03/17 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {320814/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |