MD HB1428 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, by May 31, 2019, the Board of Directors of the University of Maryland Medical System Corporation to adopt a certain conflict of interest policy; requiring annual financial disclosures; requiring the Board to ensure that the Corporation continues to be a private, nonprofit, nonstock corporation; altering the composition of, and the appointment process for, the Board; prohibiting inclusion of a State or local elected official; prohibiting a member of the Board from intentionally using the prestige of office for private gain; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 19
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {287775/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-04-05SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {916486/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-21HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-21HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2019-03-21HouseMotion Rules Suspended Referred (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0)
2019-03-21HouseMotion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (136-0)
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1428&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1428f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1428t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1428e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_19_hb1428e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1428_91648601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1428_28777501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb1428.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0887.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0888.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1428_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1179.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1428_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1608.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1416.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback