MD HB143 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a retail alcoholic beverages licensee in Montgomery County from selling alcoholic beverages for consumption off the licensed premises by means of a self-scanning cash register or a specified other automated system that may be operated on a self-service basis by a customer; and specifying penalties.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers MC 6-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-16) (Y: 119 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-16) |
2014-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {563294/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Equipment
Fines
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Penalties and Sentences
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Equipment
Fines
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Penalties and Sentences