MD HB1437 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the jurisdiction of the juvenile court over a child who is at least 13 years of age alleged to have committed a certain offense; expanding a reporting requirement by the Secretary of Juvenile Services; and expanding a certain provision relating to data collection and analysis by the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services.
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Counties
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Guns
Hijacking
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Theft
Weapons
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Guns
Hijacking
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Theft
Weapons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-14.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 530 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |