MD HB1444 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain provisions of law authorizing the use of speed monitoring systems in certain residential districts apply statewide; and requiring all speed limit signs on certain highways in residential districts to include certain signs.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Residential Districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |