MD HB145 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the statute of limitations for a prosecution relating to harassment by distribution of a deep fake image is 5 years after the victim knew or should have known of the violation; establishing that it is harassment for a person to distribute a deep fake representation that is indistinguishable from an actual and identifiable human being; establishing that revenge porn does not include certain deep fake representations; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Deep Fake Representations and Revenge Porn
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {233726/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2023-10-05 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Digital Images
Fraud
Harassment
Law Enforcement
Photography
Pornography
Records
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Digital Images
Fraud
Harassment
Law Enforcement
Photography
Pornography
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |