MD HB1525 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Camden Yards Football Sports Facility Capital Works Fund and the Camden Yards Football Sports Facility Emergency Repair Fund as special, nonlapsing funds to be administered by the Maryland Stadium Authority; providing that the purpose of the funds is to enable the Authority to pay all expenses related to capital improvements and repairs at the Camden Yards football sports facility; and requiring the transfer of certain amounts from a certain source into the funds.
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Camden Yards Football Sports Facility Special Funds - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Barnes) Adopted (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Barnes) Adopted (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/06 at 11:00 a.m. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-13) |
2024-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {863529/1 Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2024-03-14 | House | Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Barnes) Adopted (129-5) |
2024-03-04 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Building Maintenance and Repair
Economic Development
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Stadiums
State Bonds
Building Maintenance and Repair
Economic Development
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Stadiums
State Bonds
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 652.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 652.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |