MD HB1552 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an Education Savings Account program in the State; stating the purpose of the program; establishing the requirements for participation in the program; requiring a certain deposit into the account of certain students; establishing a process for calculating and depositing a certain amount; limiting the use of certain funds to certain educational purposes; establishing the autonomy of a participating private school; etc.
Title
Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB418 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-12 - Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Subjects
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Bonds
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Contracts
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Curriculum
Data
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Fees
Forms
Grants
Health
Higher Education
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Testing
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Textbooks
Tuition
Work, Labor and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Bonds
Community Colleges
Continuing Education
Contracts
Counties
Criminal Background Investigations
Curriculum
Data
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Fees
Forms
Grants
Health
Higher Education
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
School Testing
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Textbooks
Tuition
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 9.11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 9.11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 9.11 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 9.11 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 9.11 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 9.11 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 9.11 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1552?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1552f.pdf |