MD HB16 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to file a petition for a partial expungement of certain criminal records under certain circumstances; requiring a court to order that certain records be removed from a certain website; providing that only a certain record is eligible for partial expungement; and repealing a provision of law establishing that if a person is not entitled to expungement of one charge or conviction in a certain unit the person is not entitled to expungement of any other charge or conviction in the unit.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-01-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-11-20 | House | Pre-filed |