MD HB174 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-2)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-06 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that specified motor fuel tax rates be adjusted in future years based on growth in the Consumer Price Index for all urban consumers.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |