MD HB174 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain provision of law to require absent uniformed services voters and overseas voters as defined in the federal Uniformed and Overseas Citizens Absentee Voting Act and voters with a disability who do not have a Maryland driver's license or Maryland identification card and who use an online absentee ballot application or another Internet method to request an absentee ballot to provide the last four digits of the applicant's Social Security number, rather than the full Social Security number.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests - Last Four Digits of Social Security Number

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-08SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-02-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-11HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback