MD HB177 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain provision that requires a local board of elections to provide to the State Board of Elections a copy of the complaint or other pleading that initiated a judicial proceeding in which a local board is a party by removing the requirement that the copy be provided by certified mail.
Title
Election Law - Judicial Proceedings Involving Local Boards of Elections - Notice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-02-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Communications
Courts
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Hearings
Notices
Postal Service
Courts
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Hearings
Notices
Postal Service