MD HB179 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Nursing to issue a temporary license to an individual who has taken and passed an examination under the title, but is waiting for the completion of a criminal history records check; specifying the scope of the temporary license issued to the individual; and exempting the individual from the provision of law that requires the individual to have a full license to practice nursing in the State.
Title
State Board of Nursing - Temporary License - Issuance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-26 | Third Reading Passed (129-7) | |
2010-02-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |