MD HB185 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State Board of Physicians from establishing a continuing education requirement that every licensed physician complete a specific course or program as a condition to the renewal of a license.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Licensed Physicians - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Dan Morhaim [D] | Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] | Del. John Cluster [R] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] |
Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Jay Jalisi [D] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] |
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. April Rose [R] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-2) (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-2) (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99 |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance |
2016-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2016-02-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-23 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-28 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |