MD HB214 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring employers to make reasonable accommodations for employees and applicants for employment who have known limitations due to conditions related to pregnancy or childbirth; establishing a rebuttable presumption that a specified accommodation is not an undue hardship if the employer would provide it to an employee with a disability; requiring the Commission on Civil Rights to develop specified courses and public education programs regarding specified rights and responsibilities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or Childbirth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-24HouseHearing canceled
2017-01-31HouseHearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback