MD HB225 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adding an exemption from the Prince George's County school facilities surcharge for student housing designated by Bowie State University and the governing body of Prince George's County that is located within 1 mile of Bowie State University; authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County, by resolution, to impose a school facilities surcharge on new residential construction and a public safety surcharge on certain new residential construction for which a building permit has been issued; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George’s County – School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges – Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 415–19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Walker) Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {929937/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-24SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-21SenateReassigned to Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {990813/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-26HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0225&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0225f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0225t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0225e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_351_hb0225e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0225_99081301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0225_92993701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0225.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0225_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0765.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0225_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1286.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1596.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback