MD HB24 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a plea agreement from providing for concurrent sentencing for a defendant charged with multiple counts of specified child sexual offenses.
Title
Criminal Law - Plea Agreements - Prohibition of Concurrent Sentences for Child
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2010-01-29 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-13 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2009-09-17 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0024.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0024f.pdf |