MD HB24 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Comptroller to pay annually $2,000,000 of certain court costs collected by the District Court to the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund; establishing the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund to provide funding for activities and training by the Commission; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 758 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-07-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Court Costs
District Courts
Police Training Commission
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
District Courts
Police Training Commission
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Revenue and Taxes