MD HB24 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain criteria for the Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program, including increasing the number of years a recipient may hold an award, and expanding the qualifying positions for a scholarship recipient to fulfill a work obligation; authorizing, beginning in the 2023-2024 program application period, part-time students to be eligible for the scholarship, hold an award, and fulfill a work obligation; etc.
Title
Cybersecurity Scholarship Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-7) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {733525/1 Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-4) |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {963120/1 Adopted |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-01-05 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2021-09-16 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB4 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Apprentices
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Cybersecurity
Education
Education, State Department of
Higher Education
Loans
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Tuition
Work, Labor, and Employment
Apprentices
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Cybersecurity
Education
Education, State Department of
Higher Education
Loans
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Tuition
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 3501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |