MD HB248 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Home Improvement Commission Special Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; specifying the contents of the Special Fund; requiring that the Special Fund be used to cover the actual documented direct and indirect costs of fulfilling the statutory and regulatory duties of the Commission; requiring the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, or a designee of the Secretary, to administer the Special Fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Special Fund and Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783594/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Fees
Home Improvement
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Fees
Home Improvement
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations