MD HB248 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, by October 1, 2022, to adopt regulations requiring an owner or operator of a public building to establish and implement a water management program to prevent the growth and spread of Legionella pneumophila in a building water system to reduce the risk for Legionnaires' disease.
Title
Legionnaires' Disease Prevention Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB302 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Diseases
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Health
Heating and Cooling
Inspections
Licenses
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Water
Diseases
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Health
Heating and Cooling
Inspections
Licenses
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 405.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0248?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0248f.pdf |