MD HB249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a licensing requirement for specified mechanical musical devices played by the insertion of a coin or token in Carroll County.
Title
Carroll County - Mechanical Musical Devices - Licensing Requirements - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Carroll County
Counties - Local Laws
Equipment
Licenses
Public Local Laws
Carroll County
Counties - Local Laws
Equipment
Licenses
Public Local Laws