MD HB253 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements under specified circumstances for golf carts in the City of Crisfield; providing that a person who operates a golf cart on a highway in the City of Crisfield may operate the golf cart only on specified roads at specified times and only if the golf cart is equipped with specified lighting devices; requiring a person who operates a golf cart on a highway in the City of Crisfield to keep as far to the right of the roadway as feasible and possess a valid driver's license; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-5) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-5) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-31 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-5) |
2016-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {340716/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Equipment
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Somerset County
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Equipment
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Somerset County
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road