MD HB269 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a definition of "disseminate" to exclude providing information to victims of crime or their representatives; and altering the purposes of certain provisions of law relating to the Criminal Justice Information System to include provision for the rights of victims and victims' representatives to receive information to the extent practicable in accordance with certain standards developed by the United States Department of Justice.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {812913/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading Judiciary |