MD HB274 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 603
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that changes in provisions of law relating to the application of diminution credits made by the Justice Reinvestment Act shall be construed prospectively to apply to inmates who are sentenced or committed to custody on a finding of violation of probation on or after October 1, 2017; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Justice Reinvestment Act - Diminution Credits - Sentencing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-46) (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 603
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (92-46)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {772317/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-25HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback