MD HB289 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for original jurisdiction of the District Court for specified actions; prohibiting a person without authorization from the State Highway Administration from placing a sign within the right-of- way of a State highway; clarifying that such signs may be removed by the Administration or other designated agencies; authorizing the Administration or a specified county or municipal corporation government to collect civil penalties and to seek an injunction against specified violations; repealing a reporting requirement; etc.
Title
State Highway Administration - Unauthorized Signs on Highway Rights-of-Way
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (35-10) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-01 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Civil Actions
Counties
District Courts
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Signs and Billboards
Civil Actions
Counties
District Courts
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Signs and Billboards