MD HB289 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum amount of noneconomic damages that may be recovered in certain wrongful death actions or survival actions arising on or after October 1, 2018; and providing that a jury may be informed of certain limitations on noneconomic damages in certain civil actions.
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading Judiciary |