MD HB289 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB876
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Forestry Education Fund to expand and enhance the Maryland Forestry Foundation's capacity to provide certain education and resources to forest landowners, the ability of district forestry boards and the knowledge of local governments to achieve healthy and sustainable forests, and the ability of businesses to test innovative best management practices in forestry; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill $250,000 for the Fund in fiscal years 2025 and 2026.
Title
Maryland Forestry Education Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] | Del. Jackie Addison [D] | Del. Nick Allen [D] | Del. Regina Boyce [D] |
Del. Linda Foley [D] | Del. Michele Guyton [D] | Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Marvin Holmes [D] |
Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Jeffrie Long [D] | Del. Sara Love [D] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] |
Del. Vaughn Stewart [D] | Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479 |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {163523/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-27 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-02 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB876 (Carry Over) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
SB282 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
SB282 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Continuing Education
Education
Environmental Health
Foresters
Forests and Parks
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources - Generally
Revenue and Taxes
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Continuing Education
Education
Environmental Health
Foresters
Forests and Parks
Governor
Grants
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources - Generally
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 5 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |