MD HB29 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-30 - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-30 - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to apply for preliminary approval of a handgun permit without completing a certified firearms training course; requiring the Secretary to investigate an application for a handgun permit; requiring the Secretary to issue preliminary approval for a handgun permit if the applicant meets certain requirements except the required certified firearms training course; requiring an applicant to satisfy a certain firearm training requirement within 120 days after receipt of preliminary approval; etc.
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | House | Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Vallario) |
2018-03-26 | House | Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Hettleman) Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-08-30 | House | Pre-filed |