MD HB29 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting auctioneers who conduct a certain auction of secondhand precious metal objects owned by a certain estate from the licensing and regulatory requirements for secondhand precious metal object dealers and pawnbrokers; and defining the terms "auction" as a sale of real or personal property by competitive bid of prospective buyers, and "auctioneer" as a person who sells or offers to sell the real or personal property of other persons at auction, with or without receiving consideration, as a bid caller.
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-07-16 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Auctions
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Courts
Dealers
Estates and Trusts
Licenses
Pawnshops
Precious Metals and Stones
Auctions
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Courts
Dealers
Estates and Trusts
Licenses
Pawnshops
Precious Metals and Stones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |