MD HB291 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring county boards of education to post on the websites of certain local school systems hearing notices related to preliminary approval of a school site and advertisements for bids for school buildings, improvements, supplies, or equipment that exceed $100,000; increasing, from $25,000 to $100,000, the threshold amount of costs of school buildings, improvements, supplies, or equipment that trigger the requirement for county boards to advertise for bids; etc.
Title
County Boards of Education - Bid Advertisement Threshold and Electronic Posting of Hearing Notices and Bid Advertisements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274 |
2024-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-4) |
2024-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {713620/1 Adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB170 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Subjects
Communications
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Hearings
internet
Notices
Open Government
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Procurement
Public Information
Publications
Solicitation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Hearings
internet
Notices
Open Government
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Procurement
Public Information
Publications
Solicitation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 4 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |