MD HB3 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an individual who is operating a moped or motor scooter on a highway in the State to possess a valid driver's license or a valid moped operator's permit issued to the individual.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Valid Drivers' Licenses or Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2012-10-10 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Highways
Mopeds
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Highways
Mopeds
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration