MD HB318 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB302
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Board of On-Site Wastewater Professionals in the Department of the Environment to regulate individuals who provide on-site wastewater services in the State and to establish minimum standards for certain on-site wastewater systems; requiring the Department, in consultation with the Board, to set certain fees for the issuance and renewal of licenses and other Board-provided services; establishing the On-Site Wastewater Professionals Fund; requiring the Board to establish a certain code of ethics; etc.
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-10) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-40) |
2022-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {613326/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB302 (Carry Over) 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
SB479 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
SB479 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Business Regulation
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Easements
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Fees
Fines
Health
Inspections
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sewage
Time
Voting
Water
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Easements
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Fees
Fines
Health
Inspections
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sewage
Time
Voting
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 1 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 217.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9-11A | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 8 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |