MD HB319 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-11)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-11)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a specified termination provision applicable to a sales and use tax exemption for sales to specified veterans' organizations; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Veterans' Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-04-07 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2012-04-01 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (130-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-30 | First Reading Ways and Means |