MD HB32 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a surety may not provide a bail bond to a defendant in circuit court or the District Court for less than 10% of the penalty amount of the bond.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Minimum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-10-07 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Bail
Circuit Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Fees
Licenses
Pretrial Detention or Release
Rules and Regulations
Support of Dependents
Circuit Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Fees
Licenses
Pretrial Detention or Release
Rules and Regulations
Support of Dependents