MD HB331 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB663
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that an ordinance adopted by a county or municipality to regulate amateur radio station antenna structures may not preclude amateur radio communications, must accommodate amateur radio communications, and must constitute the minimum practicable regulation to accomplish the purpose of the ordinance.
Title
Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB663 (Carry Over) 2021-03-10 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |