MD HB337 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from engaging in the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas.
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |