MD HB34 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a clerk to account for and pay into the General Fund of the State the entire fee received for a trader's license issued in a county or municipal corporation that selects a uniform license fee; exempting from the fee a visually handicapped applicant who meets certain standards and Blind Industries and Services of Maryland; requiring a clerk to review the accuracy of a statement made by an applicant on the application for a trader's license regarding the applicant's place of business before issuing a license; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed 47-0 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {993793/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-09-05 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Blind Persons
Business Regulation and Occupations
Business Trusts
Comptroller
Counties
County Councils
Disabilities
Exemptions
Fees
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Traders
Blind Persons
Business Regulation and Occupations
Business Trusts
Comptroller
Counties
County Councils
Disabilities
Exemptions
Fees
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Traders