MD HB355 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish by regulation and by July 1 each year a junior deer hunt to occur on specified days during a deer hunting season; prohibiting the regulations from authorizing the junior deer hunt to occur on specified Sundays in specified counties; authorizing specified persons who are 16 years of age and younger to participate in the junior deer hunt under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Junior Deer Hunt
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Afzali [R] | Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Galen Clagett [D] |
Del. John Cluster [R] | Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Kelly Schulz [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (126-7) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-07 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-03 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Animals
Blue Laws
Counties
Guns
Hunting
Minors
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Weapons
Blue Laws
Counties
Guns
Hunting
Minors
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Weapons