MD HB356 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, beginning September 1, 2019, and annually thereafter, to provide to the county agency responsible for permitting and the local fire marshal in the county a list of nonpublic schools in the county that have been issued a certificate of approval and a list of nonpublic schools in the county that have provided the Department with a church-exempt registration form and other documentation required by certain regulations; etc.
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Nonpublic Schools - Required Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-17) (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-17) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {605760/2 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Fire Protection
Forms
internet
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Places of Worship
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Students
Work, Labor and Employment
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Curriculum
Data
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Fire Protection
Forms
internet
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Places of Worship
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Students
Work, Labor and Employment