MD HB356 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB657
Note: Carry Over of previous HB164
Note: Carry Over of previous HB164
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-27 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each public institution of higher education to adopt a policy related to pregnant and parenting students that is consistent with Title IX of the federal Higher Education Act; and requiring each public institution of higher education to post the policy on the institution's website.
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Pregnant and Parenting Students – Policy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB356 (Carry Over) 2023-03-27 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
HB164 (Carry Over) 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
HB164 (Carry Over) 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0356?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/hb/hb0356f.pdf |