MD HB363 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and the Maryland Department of Health to develop a report comparing options for offering affordable health care and dental care coverage to State residents who are ineligible for the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, the Maryland Children's Health Program, qualified health plans, or stand-alone dental plans due to the individuals' immigration status; and requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to report its findings and recommendations by October 31, 2023.
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and Maryland Department of Health - Health Care and Dental Care Coverage for Undocumented Immigrants - Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-39) |
2023-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803729/1 Adopted |
2023-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB806 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Subjects
Health - Insurance
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Immigrants and Citizenship
Public Health
Reports
Residency
studies
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Immigrants and Citizenship
Public Health
Reports
Residency
studies