MD HB367 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to include in the deer firearms season a minimum of 3 days in January for the hunting of antlerless deer.
Title
Hunting - Deer Firearms Season - January Days
Sponsors
Del. Glen Glass [R] | Del. Donald Dwyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn |
2013-02-14 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |