MD HB380 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a presumption, for the purpose of filing a Maryland income tax return, that a married couple who does not file a joint federal income tax return or married filing separate federal income tax return has filed a specified federal income tax return; authorizing specified married individuals who meet specified requirements to use the head of household filing status for a specified purpose; applying the Act, subject to specified provisions, to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married Couples
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-5) (Y: 123 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617 |
2013-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-5) |
2013-04-06 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {279930/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {235465/1 Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {795065/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-28 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |