MD HB381 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of Budget and Management, the State Comptroller, and the State Treasurer to each appoint their respective deputies to serve as designees on the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System; and altering a specified defined term to provide for specified fiduciary duties of members of specified committees established by the Board.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 9:00 a.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 8:30 a.m. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {684162/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 12:30 p.m. |
2016-01-28 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Fiduciaries
Investments
Retirement Systems
Review Boards
State Pensions and Retirement
Treasurers
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Fiduciaries
Investments
Retirement Systems
Review Boards
State Pensions and Retirement
Treasurers