MD HB381 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Baltimore County Anti-Bullying Task Force to develop certain recommendations for a policy for interacting with parents and guardians of certain students in violation of the Baltimore County Public Schools' bullying, harassment, and intimidation policy.
Title
Baltimore County Anti–Bullying Task Force – Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {285763/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Fines
Harassment
Juvenile Causes
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Public Schools
Records
Safety
Students
Threats
Violence
Youth
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Fines
Harassment
Juvenile Causes
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Public Schools
Records
Safety
Students
Threats
Violence
Youth