MD HB384 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a law enforcement officer who has been convicted of or had a conviction set aside for a felony or a misdemeanor punishable by 1 year of imprisonment or more is not entitled to a hearing under the Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Conviction - Not Entitled to a Hearing
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] |
Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Del. Maggie McIntosh [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] | Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |