MD HB395 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB8
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that funds in a certain renewable and clean energy programs account be used for the Maryland Healthy Soils Program; and requiring that $500,000 of the renewable and clean energy programs account be allocated to the Maryland Healthy Soils Program.
Title
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund - Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Use of Proceeds for Maryland Healthy Soils Program
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {673890/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB395 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Agriculture
Appropriations
Credit
Energy
Energy Matters
Renewable Energy Sources
Revenue and Taxes
Soil Conservation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Appropriations
Credit
Energy
Energy Matters
Renewable Energy Sources
Revenue and Taxes
Soil Conservation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 2 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |